Department of Inspection for Fectories and Establishment
Office Of the Deputy Inspector General, Narayanganj
Former Heads of Office
Serial No | Name of Officer | Desination
|
Tenure
|
|
To Be
|
Up To
|
|||
1 | Md. Abul Hossen | Deputy Inspector General | 06-03-2014 | 28-05-2015 |
2 | Sheikh Asaduzzaman | Deputy Inspector General
|
31-05-2015 | 31-12-2017 |
3 | Md. Ipbal Ahmed | Deputy Inspector General
|
01-01-2018 | 07-03-2019 |
4 | Soumen Barua | Deputy Inspector General
|
13-03-2019 | 22-09-2022 |
5 | Dr. Razib Chandra Das | Deputy Inspector General
|
25-09-2022
|
Ongoing
|
Planning and Implementation: Cabinet Division, A2I, BCC, DoICT and BASIS